House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Wildlife | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Rick) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Burns | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |