House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|