House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|