Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2293 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023