House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|