Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2315 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/09/2023

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2315 	By: Hilbert of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Gollihare of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to electric vehicle charging tax; 
amending 68 O.S. 2021, Sections 6504, 6506, and 6508, 
which relate to the Driving on Road Infrastructure 
with Vehicles of Electricity (DRIVE) Act of 2021; 
modifying provisions related to determination of tax 
rate; modifying reporting and remittance date for 
tax; modifying requirements with respect to the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission; updating statutory 
reference; and providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Electric vehicle charging tax 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S . 2021, Section 6504, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 6504. A.  There is hereby imposed a tax of three cents 
($0.03) per kilowatt hour or its equivalent, as determined by the 
Oklahoma Tax Corporation Commission, on the electric current used to 
charge or recharge the battery or batteries of an electric veh icle. 
The tax shall be levied beginning January 1, 2024. 
 
B.  The amount of tax prescribed or authorized by this section 
shall not include any fees or charges associated with the method for 
payment for the charging service, but shall be based only upon the 
rate of tax and the electricity transferred during the charging 
process. 
 
C. The tax imposed pursuant to this section shall not be 
applicable to electric vehicles charged at a private residence at  ENR. H. B. NO. 2315 	Page 2 
which the owner or occupant of the residence uses electric power 
paid for by the owner or occupant of the residence which is supplied 
to the residence by a regulated public utility, an electric 
cooperative or other wholesale level of electric supply, wheth er or 
not supplemented by electric power produced by the o wner or occupant 
using solar energy or other methods to provide electric power to the 
residence. 
 
D.  The tax imposed pursuant to this section shall not be 
applicable to electr ic vehicles charged at charging stations with a 
charging capacity of less than fi fty (50) kilowatts and charging 
stations that do not require payment for use. 
 
E.  In order to determine an equivalent measurement as required 
in subsection A of this section, the Oklahoma Tax Corporation 
Commission shall promulgate rules that allow businesses, based on 
the average cost that such business charged customers at the 
business’s charging stations in the preceding year, to charge the 
tax on a statewide percentage basis equivalent to the am ount of tax 
that would otherwise have been charged had the rate provided in 
subsection A of this section been applied in the preceding year.  
The percentage basis equivalent shall be recalculated annually in 
conjunction with the Oklahoma Tax through an administrative process 
outlined in Oklahoma Corporation Commission rules.  Parties who wish 
to challenge the admi nistrative calculation shall follow the proc ess 
outlined in Commissio n rules.  Businesses with multiple charging 
station locations in the state shall be authorized t o utilize the 
same percentage basis equivalent a t all such locations. The 
Oklahoma Corporation Commission shall provide the calculation , once 
deemed final by rule, to t he Oklahoma Tax Commission for collection 
from businesses. 
 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 6506, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 6506. A.  The For the period beginning January 1, 2024, 
and ending December 31, 2 028, the tax imposed pursuant to the 
provisions of Section 4 6504 of this act title shall be remitted 
monthly annually, not later than the twenty-seventh day of the first 
month following the annual period, by each charging statio n owner or 
operator.  For the periods beginning January 1, 2029, and all 
subsequent periods, the tax imposed pursuant to the provisions of 
Section 6504 of this title shall be remitted quarterly, not later 
than the twenty-seventh day of the first month foll owing the  ENR. H. B. NO. 2315 	Page 3 
quarterly period.  The tax shall be remitted using such forms as the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission may pr escribe for that purpose. 
 
B.  The tax and any Any required report shall be filed with the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission not later than the twentieth day of the 
month following the month dur ing which the electric charging for an 
electric vehicle occurred no later than the day taxes are required 
to be remitted pursuan t to subsection A of this section. 
 
C.  The charging station owner or operator shall separately 
state on any invoice or billing document provided to the customer 
the amount of the tax imposed pur suant to Section 4 6504 of this act 
title and shall not include the tax amount in the total amount 
billed to the customer. 
 
D.  The provisions of this section shall not prohibit a charging 
station owner or operator from imposing a fee or charge in addition 
to the kilowatt hour or other equivalent unit of mea surement for the 
transfer of electric power to an electric vehicle. 
 
E. Legacy chargers shal l be exempt from remitting the tax 
levied in this section until November 1, 2041. 
 
F.  Public charging stations that have ne ver charged a fee for 
their use shall be exempt from remitting the tax levied in this 
section until November 1, 2041. 
 
SECTION 3.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 6508, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 6508. A.  Except for charging stations with a charging 
capacity of less than fifty (50) kilowatts, and charging s tations 
that do not require payment for use, all charging stations in 
operation prior to the effective date of this act November 1, 2021, 
shall register with the Oklahoma Tax Commission not later than 
January 31, 2024.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall provide or make 
available updated registration info rmation to the Oklahoma 
Corporation Commission. 
 
B.  For a charging station which requires payment for its use 
and begins operations for the first time on or aft er November 1, 
2021, the charging station owner or operator shall register with the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission not later than fifteen (15) days after the 
date as of which the first business operations at the station site 
begin or by January 31, 2024, whicheve r is later.  ENR. H. B. NO. 2315 	Page 4 
 
C.  Any public charging station for an electric vehic le 
constructed or which begins operations for the first time on or 
after November 1, 2021, shall use the effective date of this act 
shall utilize a metering system that is capab le of imposing the cost 
for the charging service using a unit per kilowatt hour or an 
equivalent a comparable measurement as determined by the Tax 
Commission, such as time elapsed while charging, and the charging 
capacity of the charging station, or such as the process described 
in subsection E of Section 1 of this act. The metering system shall 
include a system by which an audit of the electricity supplied 
through the system may be performed to determine the amount of 
electricity transferred to a customer and the cost charged by the 
charging station owner or operator f or each unit of electricity 
transferred. 
 
D.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall have the authority to 
inspect the premises and equipment of any charging station owner or 
operator to enforce compliance wit h the provisions of this section. 
 
E.  If a charging station owner or operator fails to remit the 
tax as required by the provisions of this act the Driving on Road 
Infrastructure with Vehicles of Electricity (DRIVE) Act of 2021, the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission shall begin proceedings to terminate the 
charging station owner or op erator license to do business for 
failure to remit in the same manner as prescribed by law for failure 
to remit sales tax. 
 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2315 	Page 5 
 
Passed the House of Representative s the 8th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 26th day of April, 2023. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _____________ ______, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20______ _, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________