Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024