Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Jech, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|