Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 27, 2024
Bill March 2, 2023