House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2023 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative May |