House
|
05/28/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) May, Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Remove Representative May as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Weaver, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Jech, Standridge, Boren
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative May
|
|
|