Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2430 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023