Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Schreiber
|
|
|