Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023