House
|
05/26/2023
|
Remove Senator Rader as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Gollihare
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rader, Jech, Coleman, Dugger, Pederson, Stephens, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|