House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rader, Pugh, Pemberton, Paxton, Murdock, Dossett
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|