Senate | 04/09/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Menz |