Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023