House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|