Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2753 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023