Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2753 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/19/2023

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION – HB2753 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 11, 2023 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2753 	By: Miller and Lawson of the 
House 
 
  and 
 
  Weaver of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to mental health; amending 43A O.S. 
2021, Section 10-111.1, which relates to vulnerable 
adult abuse, neglect and exploitation; requiring the 
Office of the Attorney Genera l to establish and 
maintain a certain registry; requiring quarterly 
update of registry; specifying information to be 
included in registry; and providing an effective 
date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     43A O.S. 2021, Section 10 -111.1, 
is amended to read as follows: 
Section 10-111.1 A.  On or before January 1, 2019 2024, the 
Office of the Attorney General shall promulgate establish and 
maintain the Vulnerable Adult Abuse, Neglect and Exploitation Report 
Registry, accessible to the publ ic on the Internet in an electronic 
format that is easily and readily searchable updated quarterly, to 
address:   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION – HB2753 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1. A procedure for recording individuals on the registry who 
have been found guilty by a court of law or entered a plea of guilty 
or nolo contendere to a charge of abuse, neglect or exploitation of 
a vulnerable adult; and 
2.  Disclosure requirements for information that is accessible 
on the registry. 
B.  The Vulnerable Adult Abuse, Neglect a nd Exploitation 
Registry shall include but not be limited to: 
1.  The full name of the ind ividual; 
2.  Information necessary to identify the indivi dual; 
3.  The disposition and other identifying case information 
regarding convictions or confessions of abuse, neglect or 
exploitation in a court of law; and 
4.  The date the individual was convicted or pled guilty or nolo 
contendere. 
B.  The report creat ed in subsection A of this section shall be 
maintained by the Office of the Attorney General an d shall include a 
list of defendants who have been prosecuted by the Office of the 
Attorney General and have been found guilty by a court of law for 
abuse, exploitation or neglect of elderly or vulnerable adults in 
the preceding twelve (12) months.  The re port shall be provided to 
the Governor, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the 
President Pro Tempore of the Senate on an annual basis beginning 
January 31, 2019.  The report shall include, but not be limited to:   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION – HB2753 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  The name of the defendant; 
2.  The crime for which the defendant was convicted; 
3.  A description of the findings of abuse, neglect or 
exploitation by the Office of the Attorney General, i ncluding the 
circumstances surrounding the abuse; 
4.  The date of conviction or the date that a plea of guilty or 
nolo contendere was accepted by the court; 
5.  The relationship of the defenda nt to the victim; and 
6.  The county where the offense or offens es occurred. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY 
April 11, 2023 - DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS