Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2790 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023