Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2806 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/13/2023

                     
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2806 	By: Kendrix 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to sunset; amending 59 O.S. 2021, 
Section 161.4, which relates to the Board of 
Chiropractic Examiners; and removing Board from 
Oklahoma Sunset Law. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 161.4 A.  A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023, in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law .  The Board shall regulate the 
practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state;   
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2. Have practiced chiropractic continuously i n this state 
during the five (5) years immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
4.  Be a person of recogniz ed professional ability, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
5. Be in active clinical chiropractic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; and 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be rel ated within the third degree of consanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
D.  The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
1.  Position 1:  Upon expirati on of the term of the board member 
whose term expires Novembe r 2, 2006, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
2.  Position 2:  Upon expirat ion of the term of the board member 
whose term expires Novemb er 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter;   
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Position 3:  Upon expira tion of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
4.  Position 4: Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
5.  Position 5:  Upon expiration o f the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 200 8, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Gov ernor shall appoint a 
board member from District 6 for a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from District 7 for a term of thre e (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
8.  Position 8:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term o f four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and every four (4 ) years thereafter; and 
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor.   
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act, 
the state shall be divided into the following districts: 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
3.  District 3:  Kay, Lo gan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Grady, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma C ounties; 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, Bryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Counties; and 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulgee, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms. 
F.  Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall be made by the   
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 5 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the term of 
any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an unexpired 
term. 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
H.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1. Ceasing to be qualified; 
2. Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally in competent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision of the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board. 
I.  No member of the Board shall be: 
1.  A registered lobbyist;   
 
HB2806 HFLR 	Page 6 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a statewide 
organization established for the purpose of advocating the interests 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
3.  An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultant; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testi fying in a court as an expert witness. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE O N ADMINISTRATIVE RULES, dated 
02/13/2023 - DO PASS, As Amended.