Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2806 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023