Oklahoma 2024 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2806 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/01/2023

                     
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2806 	By: Kendrix of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Daniels of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to sunset; amending 59 O.S. 2021, 
Section 161.4, which relates to the Board of 
Chiropractic Examiners; and removing Board from 
Oklahoma Sunset Law. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2021, Section 161.4, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 161.4 A.  A Board of Chiropractic Examiners is hereby 
re-created to continue until July 1, 2023, in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law .  The Board shall regulate the 
practice of chiropractic in this state in accordance with the 
provisions of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act.  The Board, 
appointed by the Governor, shall be composed of eight chiropractic 
physicians and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each chiropractic physician m ember of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state;   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2. Have practiced chiropractic conti nuously in this state 
during the five (5) years immediately preceding appointment to the 
Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; 
4.  Be a person of recogniz ed professional ability, integrity 
and good reputation; and 
5. Be in active clinical chiropractic practice at least fifty 
percent (50%) of the time. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; and 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related within the third degree of consanguinity 
or affinity to any such person. 
D.  The Governor shall appoint members to the Board and for 
terms of years as follows: 
1.  Position 1:  Upon expirati on of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 2, 2006, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 1 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2010, and every four ( 4) years thereafter; 
2.  Position 2:  Upon expirat ion of the term of the board member 
whose term expires November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 2 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2009, and every four (4) years thereafter;   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Position 3:  Upon expira tion of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 3 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2011, and every four (4) yea rs thereafter; 
4.  Position 4: Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires Nov ember 1, 2007, the Governor shall appoint a 
board member from District 4 for a term of four (4) years to expire 
on November 1, 2011, and every four (4) ye ars thereafter; 
5.  Position 5:  Upon expiration o f the term of the board member 
whose term expires Ju ne 7, 2008, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from District 5 for a term of four (4) years to expire on 
June 1, 2012, and every four (4) years the reafter; 
6.  Position 6:  On June 1, 2005, the Gov ernor shall appoint a 
board member from District 6 f or a term of one (1) year to expire on 
June 1, 2006, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
7.  Position 7:  On November 1, 2005, the Governor shall appoint 
a board member from District 7 for a term of thre e (3) years to 
expire on November 1, 2008, and every four (4) years thereafter; 
8.  Position 8:  Upon expiration of the term of the board member 
whose term expires June 7, 2005, the Governor shall appoint a board 
member from the state at large for a term o f four (4) years to 
expire on June 1, 2009, and ever y four (4) years thereafter; and 
9.  Position 9:  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor.   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  For the purpose of the Oklahoma Chiropractic Practice Act, 
the state shall be divided into the following districts: 
1.  District 1:  Alfalfa, Beaver, Beckham, Caddo, Cimarron, 
Custer, Dewey, Ellis, Grant, Greer, Garfield, Harmon, Harper, 
Jackson, Kiowa, Major, Noble, Ro ger Mills, Texas, Washita, Woods and 
Woodward Counties; 
2.  District 2:  Tulsa County; 
3.  District 3: Kay, Logan, Lincoln, Osage, Pawnee, Payne and 
Pottawatomie Counties; 
4.  District 4:  Carter, Comanche, Cotton, Garvin, Grady, Love, 
Murray, Jefferson, Stephens and Tillman Counties; 
5.  District 5:  Blaine, Canadian, Cleveland, Kingfisher, 
McClain and Oklahoma Counties; 
6.  District 6:  Atoka, Bryan, Coal, Choctaw, Creek, Hughes, 
Johnston, Latimer, LeFlore, Marshall, McCurtain, Okfuskee, 
Pittsburg, Pontotoc, Pushmataha and Seminole Counties; and 
7.  District 7:  Adair, Cherokee, Craig, Delaware, Haskell, 
Mayes, McIntosh, Muskogee, Nowata, Okmulgee, Ottawa, Rogers, 
Sequoyah, Wagoner and Washington Counties. 
Members appointed after June 2002 shall serve no more than two (2) 
consecutive terms. 
F.  Each member shall hold office until the expiration of the 
term of office for which appointed or until a qualified successor 
has been duly appointed.  An appointment shall be made by the   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Governor within ninety (90) d ays after the expiration of the term of 
any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the Board due to 
resignation, death, or any other cause resulting in an unexpired 
term. 
G.  Before assuming duties on the Board, each member shall take 
and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV of 
the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in the article. 
H.  A member may be removed from the Board by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1. Ceasing to be qualified; 
2. Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdi ction of a 
felony or any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in rel ation to Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally in competent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violation of any provision of the Oklahoma 
Chiropractic Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three meetings of the Board without just 
cause, as determined by the Board. 
I.  No member of the Board shall be: 
1.  A registered lobbyist;   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2806 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  An officer, board member or employee of a statewide 
organization established for the purpose of advocating the interests 
of chiropractors licensed pursuant to the Oklahoma Chiropractic 
Practice Act; or 
3.  An insurance claims adjuster, reviewer, or consultan t; 
provided, however, a person shall not be considered to be a 
consultant solely for testi fying in a court as an expert witness. 
Passed the House of Representatives the 28th day of February, 
2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate