Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2810 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2023