House | 04/26/2023 | Vetoed 04/26/2023 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass Administrative Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kendrix |