Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|