Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023