House
|
05/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|