House
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/17/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Strom
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Remove as author Representative(s) Martinez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Thompson (Roger); authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Hall
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez
|
|
|