Senate | 03/26/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Sims, George, Hays | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Moore | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Bashore |