Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Authored by Senator Dahm | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative McCall |