Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2948 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-ENGR. H. B. NO. 2948 Page 1 1
3+HB2948 HFLR Page 1
4+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
45 2
56 3
67 4
78 5
89 6
910 7
1011 8
1112 9
1213 10
1314 11
1415 12
1516 13
1617 14
1718 15
1819 16
1920 17
2021 18
2122 19
2223 20
2324 21
2425 22
2526 23
2627 24
2728
28-ENGROSSED HOUSE
29-BILL NO. 2948 By: McCall and Sims
29+HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
30+
31+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
32+
33+2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024)
34+
35+HOUSE BILL 2948 By: McCall
3036
3137
3238
3339
3440
41+AS INTRODUCED
3542
3643 An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing
3744 for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant
3845 to Oklahoma Income Tax Code for corporations;
3946 specifying amount of deduction; specifying taxable
4047 years for which deduction is authorized; prescribing
4148 procedures for election; providing certain ex ceptions
4249 related to subsidiaries; providing for codification;
4350 and providing an effective date .
4451
4552
4653
4754
4855 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
4956 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codi fied
5057 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358. CE-1 of Title 68, unless
5158 there is created a duplication in numbering, r eads as follows:
5259 For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, based
5360 upon an election as authorized by Section 2 of this act, there shall
5461 be deducted from the Oklahoma taxable income amount for any
5562 corporation subject to the levy of inco me tax imposed pursuant to
5663 Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or from the amount
5764 of income subject to the levy of tax imposed purs uant to Section
5865 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes the following amounts:
59-1. Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income
60-amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and
61-before January 1, 2025;
6266
63-ENGR. H. B. NO. 2948 Page 2 1
67+HB2948 HFLR Page 2
68+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
6469 2
6570 3
6671 4
6772 5
6873 6
6974 7
7075 8
7176 9
7277 10
7378 11
7479 12
7580 13
7681 14
7782 15
7883 16
7984 17
8085 18
8186 19
8287 20
8388 21
8489 22
8590 23
8691 24
8792
93+1. Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income
94+amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and
95+before January 1, 2025;
8896 2. Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income
8997 amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and
9098 before January 1, 2026;
9199 3. Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income
92100 amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2025, and
93101 before January 1, 202 7;
94102 4. Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income
95103 amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2026, and
96104 before January 1, 202 8; and
97105 5. One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable
98106 income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1,
99107 2028.
100108 SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new secti on of law to be codified
101109 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358.CE-2 of Title 68, unless
102110 there is created a dup lication in numbering, reads as follows:
103111 A. Not later than June 30, 202 4, for entities in existence as
104112 of the effective date of this act, and not later than sixty (60)
105113 days after the formation of a n entity subject to taxation pursuant
106114 to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or subject to
107115 taxation pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma
108116 Statutes which occurs after the effect ive date of this act, a
109-taxpayer shall make an election, wh ich shall be irrevocable, on such
110-form as may be prescribed for such purpose by the Oklahoma Tax
111117
112-ENGR. H. B. NO. 2948 Page 3 1
118+HB2948 HFLR Page 3
119+BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1
113120 2
114121 3
115122 4
116123 5
117124 6
118125 7
119126 8
120127 9
121128 10
122129 11
123130 12
124131 13
125132 14
126133 15
127134 16
128135 17
129136 18
130137 19
131138 20
132139 21
133140 22
134141 23
135142 24
136143
144+taxpayer shall make an election, wh ich shall be irrevocable, on such
145+form as may be prescribed for such purpose by the Oklahoma Tax
137146 Commission, and except as otherwise provided by this section, to
138147 reduce taxable income as required pursuant to Section 1 of this act .
139148 B. The irrevocable election authorized by subsection A of this
140149 section shall be binding upon any subsidiary entity of the taxpayer
141150 making such election unles s otherwise provided by this section.
142151 C. The irrevocable election othe rwise prescribed by subsection
143152 A of this section shall not be binding with respect to an entity
144153 which was a subsidiary of an entity making such election during any
145154 period of time the former subs idiary was not acquired by any other
146155 entity.
147156 D. If a former subsidiary of an entity making an ele ction
148157 pursuant to subsection A of this section is acquired by another
149158 entity, the entity having acquired such former subsidi ary shall be
150159 authorized to make an irrevocable election which is binding upon the
151160 former subsidiary of the previous entity.
152161 SECTION 3. This act shall become effective January 1, 2024.
153162
154-ENGR. H. B. NO. 2948 Page 4 1
155-2
156-3
157-4
158-5
159-6
160-7
161-8
162-9
163-10
164-11
165-12
166-13
167-14
168-15
169-16
170-17
171-18
172-19
173-20
174-21
175-22
176-23
177-24
178-
179-Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2024.
180-
181-
182-
183-
184- Presiding Officer of the House
185- of Representatives
186-
187-
188-
189-Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2024.
190-
191-
192-
193-
194- Presiding Officer of th e Senate
195-
196-
163+COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 02/13/2024 - DO PASS.