Req. No. 9785 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) HOUSE BILL 2948 By: McCall AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to revenue and taxation; providing for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant to Oklahoma Income Tax Code for corporations; specifying amount of deduction; specifying taxable years for which deduction is authorized; prescribing procedures for election; providing certain ex ceptions related to subsidiaries; providing for codification; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codi fied in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358. CE-1 of Title 68, unless there is created a duplication in numbering, r eads as follows: For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, based upon an election as authorized by Section 2 of this act, there shall be deducted from the Oklahoma taxable income amount for any corporation subject to the levy of inco me tax imposed pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or from the amount of income subject to the levy of tax imposed purs uant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes the following amounts: Req. No. 9785 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1. Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and before January 1, 2025; 2. Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and before January 1, 2026; 3. Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2025, and before January 1, 202 7; 4. Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2026, and before January 1, 202 8; and 5. One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2028. SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new secti on of law to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358.CE-2 of Title 68, unless there is created a dup lication in numbering, reads as follows: A. Not later than June 30, 202 4, for entities in existence as of the effective date of this act, and not later than sixty (60) days after the formation of a n entity subject to taxation pursuant to Section 2355 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes or subject to taxation pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma Statutes which occurs after the effect ive date of this act, a Req. No. 9785 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 taxpayer shall make an election, wh ich shall be irrevocable, on such form as may be prescribed for such purpose by the Oklahoma Tax Commission, and except as otherwise provided by this section, to reduce taxable income as required pursuant to Section 1 of this act . B. The irrevocable election authorized by subsection A of this section shall be binding upon any subsidiary entity of the taxpayer making such election unles s otherwise provided by this section. C. The irrevocable election othe rwise prescribed by subsection A of this section shall not be binding with respect to an entity which was a subsidiary of an entity making such election during any period of time the former subs idiary was not acquired by any other entity. D. If a former subsidiary of an entity making an ele ction pursuant to subsection A of this section is acquired by another entity, the entity having acquired such former subsidi ary shall be authorized to make an irrevocable election which is b inding upon the former subsidiary of the previous entity. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective January 1, 2024. 59-2-9785 MAH 12/14/23