Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |