House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Kane
|
|
|