Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2981 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024