Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2989 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024