House
|
05/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Luttrell
|
|
|