Senate | 04/25/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Maynard | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader, Olsen |