Senate | 04/09/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Humphrey |