House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Maynard
|
|
|