Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 24, 2024