Senate | 04/09/2024 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Representative Stinson |