Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 24, 2024