House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|