Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill April 8, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024