Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Boles
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Adoption of amendments rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Recalled from engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Hays
|
|
|