House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Withdrawn from Retirement and Insurance committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Representative Tedford
|
|
|